FL H7135 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - Chapter No. 2013-155, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 217 (Ch. 2013-139)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - Chapter No. 2013-155, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 217 (Ch. 2013-139)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides exemption from public records requirements for payment instrument transaction information held by OFR; provides for specified access to such information; authorizes office to enter into information-sharing agreements & provide access to information contained in database to certain governmental agencies; requires a department or agency that receives confidential information to maintain confidentiality of information, except as otherwise required by court order; provides for future review & repeal of exemption; provides statement of public necessity; provides contingent effective date.
Title
Pub. Rec./Money Services Businesses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#239 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#239 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-10 | Chapter No. 2013-155, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 217 (Ch. 2013-139) | |
2013-06-07 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-05-28 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2013-04-30 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2013-04-30 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 1 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1868 |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Received |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2013-04-24 | Senate | In Messages |
2013-04-24 | House | CS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-23 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-19 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/13 |
2013-04-11 | House | Referred to- Calendar |
2013-04-11 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2013-04-10 | House | CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2013-04-10 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-04-09 | House | CS by State Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/09/13, 2:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2013-04-01 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced |
2013-03-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0217 (Related) 2013-06-10 - Chapter No. 2013-139, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7135 (Ch. 2013-155)
S1868 (Similar To) 2013-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7135 (Ch. 2013-155), CS/CS/HB 217 (Ch. 2013-139)
S0410 (Similar To) 2013-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 217 (Ch. 2013-139), CS/HB 7135 (Ch. 2013-155)
S1868 (Similar To) 2013-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7135 (Ch. 2013-155), CS/CS/HB 217 (Ch. 2013-139)
S0410 (Similar To) 2013-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 217 (Ch. 2013-139), CS/HB 7135 (Ch. 2013-155)