FL H0217 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - Chapter No. 2013-139, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7135 (Ch. 2013-155)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - Chapter No. 2013-139, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7135 (Ch. 2013-155)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires licensees engaged in check cashing to submit certain transaction information to OFR related to payment instruments cashed; requires office to maintain transaction information in centralized check cashing database; requires office to issue competitive solicitation for database to maintain certain transaction information relating to check cashing; authorizes office to request funds & to submit draft legislation after certain requirements are met; authorizes FSC to adopt rules.
Title
Money Services Businesses
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Artiles [R] | Sen. Ray Rodrigues [R] | House Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee | House Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
Rep. Travis Cummings [R] | Rep. Jose Oliva [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#25 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#238 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#238 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-10 | Chapter No. 2013-139, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7135 (Ch. 2013-155) | |
2013-06-07 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-05-28 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2013-04-30 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2013-04-30 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 410 |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Received |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2013-04-24 | Senate | In Messages |
2013-04-24 | House | CS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-23 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-19 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/13 |
2013-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-04-16 | House | Favorable by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-12 | House | On Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 04/16/13, 9:00 am, 404 HOB |
2013-04-12 | House | Now in Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2013-04-11 | House | CS/CS by Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2013-04-11 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-04-10 | House | CS/CS by Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/10/13, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2013-03-18 | House | Now in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee |
2013-03-15 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time |
2013-03-15 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-03-13 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 2 |
2013-03-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 03/13/13, 9:00 am, 404 HOB |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-01-30 | House | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2013-01-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7135 (Related) 2013-06-10 - Chapter No. 2013-155, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 217 (Ch. 2013-139)
S0410 (Same As) 2013-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 217 (Ch. 2013-139), CS/HB 7135 (Ch. 2013-155)
S1868 (Similar To) 2013-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7135 (Ch. 2013-155), CS/CS/HB 217 (Ch. 2013-139)
S0410 (Same As) 2013-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 217 (Ch. 2013-139), CS/HB 7135 (Ch. 2013-155)
S1868 (Similar To) 2013-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7135 (Ch. 2013-155), CS/CS/HB 217 (Ch. 2013-139)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
560 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
560 | 309 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
560 | 310 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |