FL H7051 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2506 (Ch. 2017-126)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2506 (Ch. 2017-126)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes duties of LBC regarding budgets of Florida Clerks of Court Operations Corporation & clerks of court; revises duties of corporation; revises budgeting requirements for court-related costs of clerks of court; requires cost of certain changes in court rules & administrative orders to be reviewed by Criminal Justice Estimating Conference; revises duties of JAC relating to budgets & payroll of clerks of court.
Title
Clerks of the Circuit Court
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#235 (Y: 80 N: 33 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2506 (Ch. 2017-126) |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Received |
2017-04-30 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Rules |
2017-04-26 | Senate | In Messages |
2017-04-26 | House | Passed; YEAS 80 NAYS 33 |
2017-04-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-25 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-20 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/17 |
2017-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-04-13 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 3 |
2017-04-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/13/17, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2017-03-27 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 7 NAYS 5 |
2017-03-23 | House | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/27/17, 12:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2017-03-10 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S2506 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Chapter No. 2017-126, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 90 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
216 | 136 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 36 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
40 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
40 | 29 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
40 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
40 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
40 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
40 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |