FL H6075 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Deletes provisions limiting authority of and prohibiting municipalities and counties from functions related to communications service providers; deletes references to, and administration and provisions of Advanced Wireless Infrastructure Deployment Act.
Title
Communications Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1848 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/6075 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/6075/BillText/Filed/PDF |