FL H5305 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2023-239), SB 2510 (Ch. 2023-243)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2023-239), SB 2510 (Ch. 2023-243)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises parameter to implement prospective payment methodology for Medicaid reimbursement rate settings for nursing home care.
Title
Medicaid Reimbursement for Nursing Home Care
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-28 - House - House Appropriations Committee (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-04 | House | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2023-239), SB 2510 (Ch. 2023-243) |
2023-04-04 | House | Substituted SB 2510 |
2023-04-03 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2023-04-03 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2023-04-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-29 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/3/2023) |
2023-03-28 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2023-03-28 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2023-03-28 | House | Reported out of Appropriations Committee |
2023-03-28 | House | Favorable by Appropriations Committee |
2023-03-24 | House | Added to Appropriations Committee agenda |
2023-03-22 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-03-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H5001 (Similar To) 2023-04-04 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2023-239), CS/CS/HB 1285 (Ch. 2023-167), HB 5101 (Ch. 2023-245), HB 5303 (Ch. 2023-246), SB 2502 (Ch. 2023-240), SB 2504 (Ch. 2023-241), SB 2506 (Ch. 2023-242), SB 2510 (Ch. 2023-243), SB 7018 (Ch. 2023-244), SB 7024 (Ch. 2023-193), SB 7030 (Ch. 2023-265)
S2510 (Similar To) 2023-06-16 - Chapter No. 2023-243, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2023-239)
S2500 (Similar To) 2023-06-16 - Chapter No. 2023-239, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1285 (Ch. 2023-167), HB 5101 (Ch. 2023-245), HB 5303 (Ch. 2023-246), SB 2502 (Ch. 2023-240), SB 2504 (Ch. 2023-241), SB 2506 (Ch. 2023-242), SB 2510 (Ch. 2023-243), SB 7018 (Ch. 2023-244), CS/SB 7024 (Ch. 2023-193), SB 7030 (Ch. 2023-265)
S2510 (Similar To) 2023-06-16 - Chapter No. 2023-243, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2023-239)
S2500 (Similar To) 2023-06-16 - Chapter No. 2023-239, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1285 (Ch. 2023-167), HB 5101 (Ch. 2023-245), HB 5303 (Ch. 2023-246), SB 2502 (Ch. 2023-240), SB 2504 (Ch. 2023-241), SB 2506 (Ch. 2023-242), SB 2510 (Ch. 2023-243), SB 7018 (Ch. 2023-244), CS/SB 7024 (Ch. 2023-193), SB 7030 (Ch. 2023-265)