FL H4009 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - See SB 2500 (line item 1607A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - See SB 2500 (line item 1607A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Graceville Inflow and Infiltration Rehabilitation.
Title
Graceville Inflow and Infiltration Rehabilitation
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Drake [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 1607A) |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-23 | House | Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-17 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/4009 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/4009/BillText/Filed/PDF |