FL H2149 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - See HB 5001 (line item 1635A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - See HB 5001 (line item 1635A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Emerald Coast Utilities Authority Septic to Sewer for Enhancement of Economic Development in the Brownsville Area Phase I.
Title
Emerald Coast Utilities Authority Septic to Sewer for Enhancement of Economic Development in the Brownsville Area Phase I
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | See HB 5001 (line item 1635A) |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-11-06 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-06 | House | Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2019-10-30 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 11/06/19, 9:30 am, Morris Hall |
2019-10-10 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-10-07 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/2149 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/2149/BillText/Filed/PDF |