FL H1355 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides exemption from public records requirements for personal identifying & location information of current & former county attorneys & assistant county attorneys & names & personal identifying & location information of spouses & children of such attorneys; provides statement of public necessity.
Title
Pub. Rec./County Attorneys and Assistant County Attorneys
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - House Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2021-03-30 | House | Now in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2021-03-30 | House | Reported out of Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-03-30 | House | Favorable by Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-03-26 | House | Added to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-05 | House | Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1602 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary