FL H1279 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits manufacturer from manufacturing, importing for profit, selling, or offering for sale cosmetic developed or manufactured using cosmetic animal testing conducted or contracted by certain persons or from conducting or contracting for cosmetic animal testing; provides labeling requirements for specified cosmetics.
Title
Cosmetic Animal Testing
Sponsors
Rep. Kristen Arrington [D] | Rep. Joseph Casello [D] | Rep. Dan Daley [D] | Rep. Anna Eskamani [D] |
Rep. Christine Hunschofsky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-12 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1718 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1279 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1279/BillText/Filed/PDF |