FL H1233 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that students have certain rights relating to attending schools that meet specific standards; requires that certain new school facilities be constructed in compliance with public shelter design criteria; provides duties for certain educational entities; provides for preemption & rulemaking.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Structurally Sound and Accessible School Facilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-08HouseReferred to PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-01HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S586 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Education

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100224Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100233Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100242Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback