FL H1233 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides definitions; provides list of commercial commodities commonly cultivated in genetically engineered form and requires DACS to publish list by specified date & to update published list annually; provides mandatory labeling requirements for genetically engineered raw agricultural commodities & processed foods made with or derived from genetically engineered ingredients; exempts specified foods, commodities, ingredients, & other substances from labeling requirements; authorizes department to adopt rules; provides for enforcement of labeling requirements; provides penalties & civil remedies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Genetically Engineered Foods

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-03HouseDied in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
2013-03-08HouseReferred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2013-03-05HouseIntroduced
2013-03-01HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1728 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Agriculture

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback