FL H0955 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes health care provider to refer patient to licensed hospital owned or leased & operated by entity in which provider has investment interest; requires health care practitioner to notify patient in writing upon referring patient to certain providers; provides requirements for such notice.
Title
Physician Referrals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#529 (Y: 88 N: 25 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Received |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2020-03-04 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed; YEAS 88 NAYS 25 |
2020-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-27 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/20 |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-12 | House | Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 1 |
2020-02-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/12/20, 10:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-02-04 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-02-03 | House | Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 1 |
2020-01-30 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 02/03/20, 2:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2020-01-15 | House | Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2020-01-15 | House | Favorable by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 2 |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 01/15/20, 9:30 am, Mashburn Hall |
2020-01-03 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-12-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1884 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
456 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 0575 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |