FL H0865 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Chapter No. 2024-33
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Chapter No. 2024-33
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises requirements for athletic coaches to include certification in cardiopulmonary resuscitation, first aid, & use of automatic external defibrillators.
Title
Youth Athletic Activities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#31 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#796 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House Education & Employment Committee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#796 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House Education & Employment Committee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-22 | Chapter No. 2024-33 | |
2024-03-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-03-19 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2024-03-05 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2024-03-05 | House | In Messages |
2024-03-05 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 830 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Received |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Fiscal Policy |
2024-03-04 | Senate | In Messages |
2024-03-04 | House | CS passed; YEAS 112, NAYS 0 |
2024-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-01 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2024-03-01 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2024-03-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-27 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2024) |
2024-02-07 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-07 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2024-02-07 | House | Reported out of Education & Employment Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | Favorable by Education & Employment Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda |
2024-02-01 | House | Now in Education & Employment Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Reported out of PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-30 | House | Added to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-25 | House | Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2024-01-25 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | Original reference removed: Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-01-25 | House | Original reference removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-01-24 | House | CS Filed |
2024-01-24 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-01-24 | House | Reported out of Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2024-01-24 | House | Favorable with CS by Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2024-01-22 | House | PCS added to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-12-27 | House | Now in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2023-12-27 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-12-27 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-12-27 | House | Referred to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2023-12-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S830 (Same As) 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 865
H1479 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
S1776 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Health Policy
H1479 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
S1776 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Health Policy