FL S1776 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring independent sanctioning authorities and the Florida High School Athletic Association, respectively, to adopt guidelines to educate certain persons on first aid and cardiopulmonary resuscitation procedures; requiring athletic coaches to hold a current certificate of successful completion of a course in cardiopulmonary resuscitation, etc.
Title
Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation Education for Athletic Coaches
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Education Pre-K -12; Rules |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H865 (Similar To) 2024-03-22 - Chapter No. 2024-33
S430 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Health Policy
S830 (Similar To) 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 865
H1479 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
S430 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Health Policy
S830 (Similar To) 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 865
H1479 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1006 | 165 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 55 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 0438 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1776 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1776/BillText/Filed/HTML |