FL H0855 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 1466 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 1466 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises method by which special district may post its final audit report on its website; deletes requirement that public facilities report & meeting materials be posted on the special district's website.
Title
Special Districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 1466 passed |
2020-03-10 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading |
2020-03-09 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading |
2020-03-06 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20 |
2020-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-06 | House | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/06/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-01-29 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Favorable by Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-27 | House | On Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee, 01/29/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-01-16 | House | Now in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee |
2020-01-16 | House | Favorable by Local Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local Administration Subcommittee, 01/16/20, 9:00 am, Webster Hall |
2019-12-16 | House | Referred to Local Administration Subcommittee; Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-12-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1466 (Similar To) 2020-06-24 - Chapter No. 2020-77
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/855 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/855/BillText/Filed/PDF |