FL H0737 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires moment at beginning of each school day & provides requirements for such moment of silence.
Title
Moments of Silence in Public Schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#552 (Y: 96 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died on Calendar |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Substituted for SB 946 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Received |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2020-03-04 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed; YEAS 96 NAYS 20 |
2020-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-27 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/20 |
2020-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-18 | House | Favorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 02/18/20, 3:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2020-02-10 | House | Now in Education Committee |
2020-02-10 | House | Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-06 | House | On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/10/20, 1:30 pm, Reed Hall |
2020-02-04 | House | Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-02-04 | House | Favorable by PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-31 | House | On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 8:00 am, Reed Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-16 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2019-11-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S946 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 737