FL H0733 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises rights not affected or extinguished by marketable record titles; revises what types of interests are extinguished by marketable record title; provides that discriminatory restrictions are unlawful & unenforceable; provides certain discriminatory restrictions are extinguished & severed from recorded title transactions; provides requirements for parcel owner to remove discriminatory restriction from covenant or restriction; requires persons with certain interests in land which may be extinguished to file notice to preserve such interests.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marketable Record Title Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#612 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Judiciary
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-03-09SenateReceived
2020-03-09SenateReferred to Judiciary; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules
2020-03-09SenateIn Messages
2020-03-09HouseCS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0
2020-03-09HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-06HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-06HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-03HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20
2020-02-10HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-07HouseCS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
2020-02-07HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-06HouseCS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2020-02-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/06/20, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2020-01-27HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2020-01-27HouseCS referred to Judiciary Committee
2020-01-27HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2020-01-24HouseCS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-01-24HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-01-22HouseCS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2020-01-17HouseOn Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 01/22/20, 8:30 am, Sumner Hall
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-12-16HouseReferred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2019-11-21HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S802 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
S1154 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
H623 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
H689 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in returning Messages
S374 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Ordered enrolled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
71203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
71204Amended CodeSee Bill Text
712065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
71212Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback