GA HB974 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Effective Date 2024-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Effective Date 2024-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 21 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to primaries and elections generally, so as to require the Secretary of State to establish and maintain a state-wide system for the posting of scanned paper ballots; to provide for minimum resolution requirements for such scans; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Secretary of State; establish and maintain a state-wide system for the posting of scanned paper ballots; require
Sponsors
Rep. John LaHood [R] | Rep. Victor Anderson [R] | Rep. Rob Leverett [R] | Rep. Shaw Blackmon [R] |
Rep. Todd Jones [R] | Rep. James Burchett [R] | Sen. Max Burns [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - House - Agree To Senate Substitute: House Vote #841 (Y: 136 N: 29 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #814 (Y: 47 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Hb 101, Hb 946, Hb 581, Hr 1022, Hb 264, Hb 974, Hb 976, Hb 977, Hb 1021, Hb 1207, Hb 814, Hb 82, Hb 971, Hb 1182, Hr 804, Hr 96: Senate Vote #763 (Y: 32 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - Passage: House Vote #567 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #814 (Y: 47 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Hb 101, Hb 946, Hb 581, Hr 1022, Hb 264, Hb 974, Hb 976, Hb 977, Hb 1021, Hb 1207, Hb 814, Hb 82, Hb 971, Hb 1182, Hr 804, Hr 96: Senate Vote #763 (Y: 32 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - Passage: House Vote #567 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | Effective Date 2024-07-01 | |
2024-05-06 | Act 589 | |
2024-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-02-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-07 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2024-02-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-01-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-01-23 | House | House First Readers |
2024-01-22 | House | House Hopper |