FL H0643 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1048 (Ch. 2021-182)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1048 (Ch. 2021-182)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides public records exemption for certain conviction integrity unit reinvestigation information; provides for future review & repeal of exemption; provides statement of public necessity.
Title
Pub. Rec./Conviction Integrity Unit Reinvestigation Information
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Government Operations Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Government Operations Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | House | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1048 (Ch. 2021-182) |
2021-04-06 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-04-06 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2021-04-06 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Favorable by Judiciary Committee |
2021-04-02 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2021-03-30 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-30 | House | Reported out of Government Operations Subcommittee |
2021-03-30 | House | Favorable by Government Operations Subcommittee |
2021-03-26 | House | Added to Government Operations Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-21 | House | Now in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2021-03-21 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-21 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee |
2021-03-17 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-03-17 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-17 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-17 | House | Reported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-16 | House | Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-12 | House | Added to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-18 | House | Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-02-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1048 (Same As) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-182