FL H0473 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes amendment to s. 3, Art. VII of State Constitution to allow Legislature, by general law, to exempt from taxation property owned by municipality.
Title
Municipal Property Tax Exemption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died in Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2014-03-28 | House | Now in Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2014-03-27 | House | CS by Finance and Tax Subcommittee read 1st time |
2014-03-27 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-03-26 | House | CS by Finance and Tax Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 3 |
2014-03-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax Subcommittee, 03/26/14, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-01-16 | House | Referred to Finance and Tax Subcommittee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee; Appropriations Committee |
2014-01-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0704 (Similar To) 2014-04-23 - Withdrawn from further consideration