FL S0704 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Withdrawn from further consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Withdrawn from further consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing an amendment to the State Constitution to allow the Legislature, by general law, to exempt from taxation any property owned by a municipality, etc.
Title
Municipal Property Tax Exemption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from further consideration |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0473 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/704 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0704/BillText/Filed/HTML |