FL H0399 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes property appraiser to make proposed property tax & non-ad valorem assessment notices available on website in lieu of mailing notices; requires property appraiser to hold public hearing before posting notices; specifies items included on property appraiser's website; requires property appraiser to mail notice containing specified information for specified timeframe after implementing web-based noticing system; specifies items that must be included on website to inform new property owners of their options for receiving notification of notices & their appeal rights; revises dates within which taxpayers may petition value adjustment board on valuation issues.
Title
Millage Notices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Ways and Means Committee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-13 | House | Now in Ways and Means Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Favorable by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2019-02-06 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 02/13/19, 8:30 am, 12 HOB |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-01-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S564 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Finance and Tax
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
192 | 0105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
193 | 073 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
193 | 114 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
193 | 1142 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
194 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
200 | 069 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/399 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/399/BillText/Filed/PDF |