FL H0371 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Economic Development Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Economic Development Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes county governing bodies to apply to OTTED to amend boundary of specified enterprise zones; authorizes OTTED to approve amendment application subject to specified requirements; requires OTTED to establish amendment effective date; authorizes Martin County to apply to OTTED for designation of enterprise zone; authorizes OTTED to designate enterprise zone in Martin County.
Title
Enterprise Zones
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Economic Development Policy (EDCA) | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Economic Development Policy (EDCA); Finance & Tax Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00037 | |
2009-12-18 | Referred to Economic Development Policy (EDCA); Finance & Tax Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council | |
2009-11-16 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1000 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Commerce
S1754 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means
S1754 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means