FL S1754 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the City of Palm Bay and Martin County to apply to the OTTED for designation of an enterprise zone. Authorizes certain governing bodies to apply to the OTTED to amend the boundary of an enterprise zone that includes a rural area of critical economic concern. Requires that the OTTED establish the effective date of certain enterprise zones. Authorizes the OTTED to designate an enterprise zone in Martin County, etc.
Title
Enterprise Zones [WPSC]
Sponsors
Rep. Thad Altman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means | |
2010-04-14 | Now in Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00599 | |
2010-04-13 | Favorable by Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00599 | |
2010-04-08 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations, 04/13/10, 2:45 pm, 309-C | |
2010-04-07 | Now in Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations -SJ 00524 | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable by Finance and Tax; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00524 | |
2010-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 04/06/10, 3:15 pm, 301-S | |
2010-03-30 | Now in Finance and Tax -SJ 00333 | |
2010-03-24 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-03-23 | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 00333; CS read 1st time on 03/24/10 -SJ 00334 | |
2010-03-18 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/23/10, 1:00 pm, 412-K | |
2010-03-10 | Favorable by Commerce; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 00188; Now in Community Affairs -SJ 00188 | |
2010-03-05 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce, 03/10/10, 8:00 am, 401-S | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Commerce; Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00120 | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Commerce; Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means | |
2010-02-05 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0993 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Economic Development Policy (EDCA)
H0371 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Economic Development Policy (EDCA)
S1000 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Commerce
H0371 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Economic Development Policy (EDCA)
S1000 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Commerce
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0290 | 0055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0290 | 00726 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0290 | 00727 | New Code | See Bill Text |