FL H0343 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-12-17 - Withdrawn from Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); Rules and Calendar Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; Withdrawn prior to introduction
Status: Introduced on November 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-12-17 - Withdrawn from Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); Rules and Calendar Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; Withdrawn prior to introduction
Summary
Designates act "Restoring Faith in Public Office Act; provides misdemeanor penalties for knowing commission of offenses involving solicitation or acceptance of gifts, acceptance of unauthorized compensation, or misuse of public position; requires mandatory fines.
Title
Standards of Conduct
Sponsors
Rep. Ari Porth [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-12-17 | Withdrawn from Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); Rules and Calendar Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; Withdrawn prior to introduction | |
2009-12-10 | Referred to Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); Rules and Calendar Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council | |
2009-11-12 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0347 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)
S1546 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Ethics and Elections
S1546 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Ethics and Elections
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=0343&Chamber=House&Year=2010 |