FL H0347 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides criminal penalties for certain violations of standards of conduct for public officials in addition to existing penalties; defines term "under color of law"; provides for reclassification of offenses committed if commission of offense was furthered or facilitated by person acting under color of law; provides exception; defines term "willfully", etc.
Title
Criminal Justice
Sponsors
Rep. Carl Domino [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA) | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); Rules and Calendar Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00035 | |
2009-12-10 | Referred to Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); Rules and Calendar Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council | |
2009-11-12 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0343 (Similar To) 2009-12-17 - Withdrawn from Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); Rules and Calendar Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; Withdrawn prior to introduction
H0489 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)
S0734 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
S1546 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Ethics and Elections
H0489 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)
S0734 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
S1546 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Ethics and Elections
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0112 | 313 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0287 | 175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0775 | 0862 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0838 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0914 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |