FL H0317 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides requirements for websites of ticket resellers; provides for donation, transfer, & resale of certain tickets; authorizes original seller to request certain information from final ticket holders; prohibits original ticket seller from taking certain actions against person who purchases or resells ticket; preempts regulation of sale or resale of tickets to state.
Title
Resale of Tickets
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | Died in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-02-01 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2023-01-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S388 (Same As) 2023-05-05 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/317 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/317/BillText/Filed/PDF |