FL H0237 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires written notice of intent to initiate litigation for relief related to personal injury protection benefits; revises requirements for demand letter for personal injury protection benefits; prohibits actions by & prosecutions on behalf of claimants unless certain requirements are met.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Demand Letters for Personal Injury Protection Benefits

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30HouseDied in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-01-22HouseReferred to Civil Justice and Property Rights Subcommittee; Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2021-01-13HouseFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
627736Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback