FL H0171 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-09-29 - Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Pending: House Criminal Justice and Public Safety Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Specifies to rehabilitate offender to transition back to community successfully is one of primary purposes of sentencing; reduces minimum sentence that must be served by defendant from 85 percent of sentence to 65 percent; revises provisions concerning gain time to provide for outstanding deed gain-time, good behavior time, & rehabilitation credits; revises limits on awards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Rehabilitation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-29HouseNow in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2021-09-29HouseReferred to Judiciary Committee
2021-09-29HouseReferred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-09-29HouseReferred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2021-09-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S470 (Similar To) 2021-10-13 - Filed
S504 (Similar To) 2021-10-14 - Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
316027Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3161935Amended CodeSee Bill Text
381004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
775084Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7750845Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7750847Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7750861Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7750862Amended CodeSee Bill Text
775087Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7750875Amended CodeSee Bill Text
77703Amended CodeSee Bill Text
77704Amended CodeSee Bill Text
78407Amended CodeSee Bill Text
794011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7940115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
794023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
812081Amended CodeSee Bill Text
817568Amended CodeSee Bill Text
831032Amended CodeSee Bill Text
84322Amended CodeSee Bill Text
87404Amended CodeSee Bill Text
921002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944275Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944281Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944473Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94470Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
947005Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback