FL S0470 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the issuance of civil citations for the possession of 20 grams or less of cannabis and the possession of drug paraphernalia used in connection with the consumption of cannabis; providing for civil fines; providing for community service in lieu of civil fines; revising a principle of the Criminal Punishment Code relating to a prisoner's required minimum term of imprisonment, etc.
Title
Revising Penalties for Nonviolent Offenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H171 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
S504 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
H725 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
H957 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
S1486 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
S504 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
H725 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
H957 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
S1486 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
893 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 147 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 275 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/470 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/470/BillText/Filed/HTML |