FL S0504 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 14 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - Referred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Appropriations
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the principles embodied by the Criminal Punishment Code as it relates to punishment and rehabilitation; authorizing the Department of Corrections to grant deductions from sentences in the form of good behavior time, rehabilitation credits, and outstanding deed awards, rather than solely for gain-time, for specified purposes; revising the "tentative release date" the department must calculate for each prisoner based on his or her good behavior time, rehabilitation credits, and outstanding deed awards; requiring the department to grant good behavior time, rather than basic gain-time, as a means of encouraging satisfactory behavior and developing character traits necessary for successful reentry to the community, subject to certain conditions, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Convictions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-03SenateReferred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Appropriations
2021-10-14SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H171 (Similar To) 2021-09-29 - Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
S470 (Similar To) 2021-10-21 - Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
316027Amended CodeSee Bill Text
775084Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7750845Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7750847Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7750861Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7750862Amended CodeSee Bill Text
775087Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7750875Amended CodeSee Bill Text
77703Amended CodeSee Bill Text
77704Amended CodeSee Bill Text
784078Amended CodeSee Bill Text
794011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
794023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
817568Amended CodeSee Bill Text
831032Amended CodeSee Bill Text
84322Amended CodeSee Bill Text
87404Amended CodeSee Bill Text
90005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
921002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94402Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944275Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944281Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944473Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944605Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944607Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94470Amended CodeSee Bill Text
947005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9854815Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback