FL H0153 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 21 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-21 - Added to Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires President of Senate & Speaker of House of Representatives to each appoint one member to State Council on Interstate Educational Opportunity for Military Children, rather than appoint one member jointly; & extends scheduled repeal of compact & related provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Interstate Compact on Educational Opportunity for Military Children

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-20 - House - House Education & Employment Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-12-01 - House - House Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-21HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2022-01-21HouseBill released to House Calendar
2022-01-21HouseReported out of Education & Employment Committee
2022-01-20HouseFavorable by Education & Employment Committee
2022-01-18HouseAdded to Education & Employment Committee agenda
2022-01-13HouseNow in Education & Employment Committee
2022-01-13HouseReported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2022-01-13HouseFavorable by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-11HouseAdded to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda
2021-12-03HouseNow in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2021-12-03HouseReferred to Education & Employment Committee
2021-12-03HouseReferred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2021-12-02HouseCS Filed
2021-12-02HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-12-02HouseReported out of Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee
2021-12-01HouseFavorable with CS by Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee
2021-11-23HouseAdded to Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee agenda
2021-09-29HouseNow in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee
2021-09-29HouseReferred to Education & Employment Committee
2021-09-29HouseReferred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2021-09-29HouseReferred to Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee
2021-09-21HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S430 (Same As) 2022-01-20 - Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
H465 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Added to Second Reading Calendar
S438 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 01/26/22, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100039Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100040Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/153
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/153/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/153/BillText/c1/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/153/Amendment/689497/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/153/Analyses/h0153.ELE.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/153/Analyses/h0153a.ELE.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/153/Analyses/h0153b.LAV.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/153/Analyses/h0153c.LAV.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/153/Analyses/h0153d.EEC.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/153/Analyses/h0153e.EEC.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=60906&IsPCB=0&BillId=73201
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=61854&IsPCB=0&BillId=73201
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=62856&IsPCB=0&BillId=73201

Bill Comments

feedback