FL H0131 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-167
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that all matters in chapters 97 through 105, F.S., are preempted to state, unless otherwise specified; defines term "absent uniformed services voter"; revises definition of term "overseas voter"; revises voter challenge oath requirements; provides circumstances under which challenged voter may execute change of legal residence, be directed to proper precinct, or vote provisional ballot, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections [GPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0004 - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-29 - House - House Roll Call No. 1083 - Passage (Y: 110 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-18 - House - House Roll Call No. 0595 - Passage (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-28 Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-167
2010-05-13 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2010-04-29 In returning messages; Amendment(s) to Senate amendment(s) failed -HJ 01278; Concurred -HJ 01268; CS passed as amended; YEAS 110 NAYS 6 -HJ 01279; Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 01279
2010-04-29 Read 3rd time -SJ 01023; Amendment(s) reconsidered, withdrawn -SJ 01024; Amendment(s) adopted (136818) -SJ 01024; CS passed as amended (136818); YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 01034
2010-04-26 Withdrawn from Ethics and Elections; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations -SJ 00820; Substituted for CS/CS/SB 900 -SJ 00820; Read 2nd time -SJ 00820; Amendment(s) adopted (710974, 612746, 315994) -SJ 00820
2010-04-21 Received -SJ 00718; Referred to Ethics and Elections; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations -SJ 00718
2010-03-23 In Messages
2010-03-18 Read 3rd time -HJ 00326; Amendment(s) adopted -HJ 00326; CS passed as amended; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 -HJ 00326
2010-03-16 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00294
2010-03-11 Placed on Calendar -HJ 00266
2010-03-10 Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.20
2010-03-11 CS read 1st time on 03/11/10 -HJ 00263
2010-03-10 CS/CS by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 00267
2010-03-08 Original reference(s) removed: Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED); CS referred to Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00224; On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 03/10/10, 10:45 am, 404-H
2010-03-05 CS read 1st time on 03/05/10 -HJ 00220; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20
2010-03-03 CS by Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 00221
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00019; On Committee agenda-- Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA), 02/17/10, 8:30 am, Webster Hall --Workshopped; PCS on Committee agenda-- Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA), 03/03/10, 8:00 am, 306-H
2010-03-01 PCS on Committee agenda-- Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA), 03/03/10, 8:00 am, 306-H
2010-02-10 On Committee agenda-- Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA), 02/17/10, 8:30 am, Webster Hall --Workshopped
2009-10-12 Referred to Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council
2009-09-18 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S1682 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Oversight and Accountability, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 131 (Ch. 2010-167)
S0900 (Similar To) 2010-04-26 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00819; Amendment(s) adopted (952218) -SJ 00820; Amendment(s) failed -SJ 00820; Substituted CS/CS/HB 131 -SJ 00820; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 131 (Ch. 2010-167) -SJ 00820
H1019 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 131 (Ch. 2010-167)
H0869 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 131 (Ch. 2010-167)
H1207 (Similar To) 2010-07-19 - Veto Message received -HJ 00010; Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
H7101 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 131 (Ch. 2010-167)
S0880 (Similar To) 2010-03-24 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00330; Amendment(s) failed -SJ 00331; Amendment(s) adopted (966272) -SJ 00331; Substituted CS/CS/HB 1207 (Vetoed by Governor) -SJ 00332; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 131 (Ch. 2010-167) -SJ 00332
S0902 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 131 (Ch. 2010-167), HB 1301 (Ch. 2010-112)
S1672 (Similar To) 2010-04-29 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 01008; Amendment(s) adopted (164906) -SJ 01008; Substituted CS/CS/HB 869 (Died on Senate Calendar) -SJ 01008; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 131 (Ch. 2010-167) -SJ 01008
S2536 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 131 (Ch. 2010-167)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
00970115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0097021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
00980981Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0101111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
010156075Amended CodeSee Bill Text
01015612Amended CodeSee Bill Text
010162Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0101694Amended CodeSee Bill Text
01016952Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0101697Amended CodeSee Bill Text
010171Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0102012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0102111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0102112Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0102141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0102166Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0106011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0106022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
010603Amended CodeSee Bill Text
010604Amended CodeSee Bill Text
01060703Amended CodeSee Bill Text
01060705Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0106071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
010608Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0106143Amended CodeSee Bill Text
01061437Amended CodeSee Bill Text
01061439Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0106147Amended CodeSee Bill Text
010617Amended CodeSee Bill Text
010625Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0379352Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=0131&Chamber=House&Year=2010
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb013100.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb013101c1.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb013102c2.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb013103e1.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb013104e2.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/hHB01310318100595.html
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/hHB01310429101083.html
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/SHB01310429100004.html

Bill Comments

feedback