FL S2536 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 131 (Ch. 2010-167)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Reenacts specified provisions relating to political committees, contributions, expenditures, electioneering communications, and electioneering communications organizations. Reenacts a specified provision relating to electronic filing of campaign treasurer's reports. Reenacts specified provisions relating to limitations on contributions. Reenacts a specified provision relating to telephone solicitation, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections [GPSC]

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Committee on Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 131 (Ch. 2010-167)
2010-03-11 Introduced -SJ 00217
2010-03-04 Referred to Ethics and Elections; Judiciary; Policy & Steering Committee on Governmental Operations -SJ 00217
2010-02-26 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H1207 (Similar To) 2010-07-19 - Veto Message received -HJ 00010; Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
S0880 (Similar To) 2010-03-24 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00330; Amendment(s) failed -SJ 00331; Amendment(s) adopted (966272) -SJ 00331; Substituted CS/CS/HB 1207 (Vetoed by Governor) -SJ 00332; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 131 (Ch. 2010-167) -SJ 00332
H0869 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 131 (Ch. 2010-167)
H0131 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-167

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
0106011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0106022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
010603Amended CodeSee Bill Text
010604Amended CodeSee Bill Text
01060703Amended CodeSee Bill Text
01060705Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0106071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
010608Amended CodeSee Bill Text
01061437Amended CodeSee Bill Text
01061439Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0106147Amended CodeSee Bill Text
010617Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback