FL H1207 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-19 - Veto Message received -HJ 00010; Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
Pending: House Rules & Calendar Council Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-19 - Veto Message received -HJ 00010; Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
Pending: House Rules & Calendar Council Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for establishment of affiliated party committees; provides for definitions, duties, exemptions, exclusions, restrictions, penalties, & responsibilities of affiliated party committees; revises affected definitions in chapter 106, F.S.; amends definitions of expenditures & gifts, etc.
Title
Campaign Financing [GPSC]
Sponsors
Rep. Seth McKeel [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0007 - Passage (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-18 - House - House Roll Call No. 0594 - Motion (Y: 73 N: 42 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-18 - House - House Roll Call No. 0593 - Passage (Y: 73 N: 42 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-18 - House - House Roll Call No. 0592 - (Y: 38 N: 71 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-18 - House - House Roll Call No. 0591 - (Y: 43 N: 69 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-18 - House - House Roll Call No. 0590 - (Y: 43 N: 71 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-18 - House - House Roll Call No. 0589 - (Y: 46 N: 69 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-18 - House - House Roll Call No. 0588 - (Y: 41 N: 71 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-18 - House - House Roll Call No. 0587 - (Y: 42 N: 71 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-18 - House - House Roll Call No. 0586 - (Y: 41 N: 70 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-18 - House - House Roll Call No. 0585 - (Y: 42 N: 69 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-18 - House - House Roll Call No. 0584 - (Y: 42 N: 69 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-16 - House - House Roll Call No. 0573 - (Y: 44 N: 73 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-16 - House - House Roll Call No. 0572 - (Y: 43 N: 66 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-16 - House - House Roll Call No. 0571 - (Y: 43 N: 69 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-18 - House - House Roll Call No. 0594 - Motion (Y: 73 N: 42 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-18 - House - House Roll Call No. 0593 - Passage (Y: 73 N: 42 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-18 - House - House Roll Call No. 0592 - (Y: 38 N: 71 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-18 - House - House Roll Call No. 0591 - (Y: 43 N: 69 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-18 - House - House Roll Call No. 0590 - (Y: 43 N: 71 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-18 - House - House Roll Call No. 0589 - (Y: 46 N: 69 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-18 - House - House Roll Call No. 0588 - (Y: 41 N: 71 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-18 - House - House Roll Call No. 0587 - (Y: 42 N: 71 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-18 - House - House Roll Call No. 0586 - (Y: 41 N: 70 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-18 - House - House Roll Call No. 0585 - (Y: 42 N: 69 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-18 - House - House Roll Call No. 0584 - (Y: 42 N: 69 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-16 - House - House Roll Call No. 0573 - (Y: 44 N: 73 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-16 - House - House Roll Call No. 0572 - (Y: 43 N: 66 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-16 - House - House Roll Call No. 0571 - (Y: 43 N: 69 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-19 | Veto Message received -HJ 00010; Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016 | |
2010-04-06 | Vetoed by Governor, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 131 (Ch. 2010-167) -HJ 00629 | |
2010-03-30 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -HJ 00426 | |
2010-03-25 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 00400 | |
2010-03-24 | Withdrawn from Ethics and Elections -SJ 00331; Substituted for CS/SB 880 -SJ 00332; Read 2nd time -SJ 00332; Read 3rd time -SJ 00332; CS passed; YEAS 25 NAYS 11 -SJ 00332 | |
2010-03-18 | In Messages; Received -SJ 00276; Referred to Ethics and Elections -SJ 00277 | |
2010-03-18 | Read 3rd time -HJ 00320; Amendment(s) failed -HJ 00321; CS passed as amended; YEAS 73 NAYS 42 -HJ 00325; Immediately certified -HJ 00332 | |
2010-03-16 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00286; Amendment(s) failed -HJ 00287; Amendment(s) adopted -HJ 00288 | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 00266 | |
2010-03-10 | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.20 | |
2010-03-11 | CS read 1st time on 03/11/10 -HJ 00265 | |
2010-03-10 | CS/CS by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 11 NAYS 5 -HJ 00268 | |
2010-03-08 | Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00225; On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 03/10/10, 10:45 am, 404-H | |
2010-03-04 | CS read 1st time on 03/04/10 -HJ 00216; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20 | |
2010-03-03 | CS by Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); YEAS 9 NAYS 4 -HJ 00218 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00108; On Committee agenda-- Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA), 03/03/10, 8:00 am, 306-H | |
2010-03-01 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA), 03/03/10, 8:00 am, 306-H | |
2010-02-25 | Referred to Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council | |
2010-02-23 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1928 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Ethics and Elections
S2536 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 131 (Ch. 2010-167)
S0880 (Similar To) 2010-03-24 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00330; Amendment(s) failed -SJ 00331; Amendment(s) adopted (966272) -SJ 00331; Substituted CS/CS/HB 1207 (Vetoed by Governor) -SJ 00332; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 131 (Ch. 2010-167) -SJ 00332
H0131 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-167
H0869 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 131 (Ch. 2010-167)
S2536 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 131 (Ch. 2010-167)
S0880 (Similar To) 2010-03-24 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00330; Amendment(s) failed -SJ 00331; Amendment(s) adopted (966272) -SJ 00331; Substituted CS/CS/HB 1207 (Vetoed by Governor) -SJ 00332; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 131 (Ch. 2010-167) -SJ 00332
H0131 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-167
H0869 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 131 (Ch. 2010-167)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0011 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0103 | 081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0103 | 092 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0103 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0106 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0106 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0106 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0106 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0106 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0106 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0106 | 0701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0106 | 0703 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0106 | 0705 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0106 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0106 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0106 | 088 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0106 | 113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0106 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0106 | 143 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0106 | 1437 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0106 | 1439 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0106 | 147 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0106 | 165 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0106 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0106 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0106 | 265 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0106 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0106 | 29 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0112 | 312 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0112 | 3215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |