FL S0900 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-26 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00819; Amendment(s) adopted (952218) -SJ 00820; Amendment(s) failed -SJ 00820; Substituted CS/CS/HB 131 -SJ 00820; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 131 (Ch. 2010-167) -SJ 00820
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Extends the deadline by which persons with disabilities will be required to vote on voter interface devices that meet certain requirements. Requires the supervisor of elections to notify the absent uniformed services voter and overseas voter of the free access system for determining absentee ballot status. Provides a timeframe for an absentee ballot to be sent to each absent uniformed services voter and overseas voter, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voting [GPSC]

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-26 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00819; Amendment(s) adopted (952218) -SJ 00820; Amendment(s) failed -SJ 00820; Substituted CS/CS/HB 131 -SJ 00820; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 131 (Ch. 2010-167) -SJ 00820
2010-04-23 Placed on Special Order Calendar
2010-04-21 Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute); Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00703
2010-04-19 CS/CS by- Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 00703; CS read 1st time on 04/21/10 -SJ 00705
2010-04-14 On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations, 04/19/10, 10:30 am, 309-C
2010-03-08 Original reference(s) removed: Rules; Now in Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations -SJ 00248
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Ethics and Elections; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations; Rules -SJ 00065; On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 02/17/10, 8:00 am, 412-K; CS by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 00164; CS read 1st time on 03/02/10 -SJ 00157; Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2010-02-19 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2010-02-17 CS by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2010-02-08 On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 02/17/10, 8:00 am, 412-K
2010-01-14 Referred to Ethics and Elections; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations; Rules
2009-12-10 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0131 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-167
S1682 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Oversight and Accountability, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 131 (Ch. 2010-167)
H1019 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 131 (Ch. 2010-167)
H0869 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 131 (Ch. 2010-167)
S1672 (Similar To) 2010-04-29 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 01008; Amendment(s) adopted (164906) -SJ 01008; Substituted CS/CS/HB 869 (Died on Senate Calendar) -SJ 01008; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 131 (Ch. 2010-167) -SJ 01008
H7101 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 131 (Ch. 2010-167)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
00970115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0097021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
00980981Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0101111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
010156075Amended CodeSee Bill Text
01015612Amended CodeSee Bill Text
010162Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0101694Amended CodeSee Bill Text
01016952Amended CodeSee Bill Text
010171Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0102012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0102111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0102112Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0102141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0102166Amended CodeSee Bill Text
010603Amended CodeSee Bill Text
010604Amended CodeSee Bill Text
010607Amended CodeSee Bill Text
01060705Amended CodeSee Bill Text
010611Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0106143Amended CodeSee Bill Text
010629Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0379352Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback