FL H0075 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires school districts to make feminine hygiene products available, at no charge, in female restroom facilities of public school buildings.
Title
Feminine Hygiene Products in Public Schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-01-15 | House | Referred to Secondary Education and Career Development Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education and Employment Committee |
2020-12-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S242 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Education
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/75 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/75/BillText/Filed/PDF |