FL H0003 | 2017 | Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chapter No. 2017-234
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides appropriations relating to FEFP; provides for uses of funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Education Finance Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#488 (Y: 107 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-28 Chapter No. 2017-234
2017-06-26 Approved by Governor
2017-06-19 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2017-06-09HouseOrdered enrolled
2017-06-09SenatePassed; YEAS 31 NAYS 4
2017-06-09SenateRead 3rd time
2017-06-09SenateRead 2nd time
2017-06-09SenateSubstituted for SB 2500-A
2017-06-09SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2017-06-09SenateWithdrawn from Appropriations
2017-06-09SenateReceived
2017-06-09SenateReferred to Appropriations
2017-06-09SenateIn Messages
2017-06-09HousePassed; YEAS 107 NAYS 6 21
2017-06-09HouseRead 3rd time
2017-06-08HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2017-06-08HouseRead 2nd time
2017-06-07HouseIntroduced
2017-06-07HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 06/08/17
2017-06-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-06-07HouseFavorable by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 27 NAYS 0
2017-06-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 06/07/17, 1:30 pm, Webster Hall
2017-06-05HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2017-06-05HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S2500 (Similar To) 2017-06-09 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 3-A (Ch. 2017-234)
S2502 (Similar To) 2017-06-09 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 3-A (Ch. 2017-234)

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback