FL S2502 | 2017 | Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-09 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 3-A (Ch. 2017-234)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing the distribution of funds for the Florida Education Finance Program pursuant to any law providing funding for the 2017-2018 fiscal year; providing for construction of the act in pari materia with laws enacted during the 2017 Regular Session of the Legislature, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Implementing SB 2500-A, an Act Making Supplemental Appropriations to Fund the Florida Education Finance Program for the 2017-2018 Fiscal Year

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09SenateDied on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 3-A (Ch. 2017-234)
2017-06-08SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2017-06-08SenateOrdered engrossed
2017-06-08SenateAmendment(s) adopted (930208)
2017-06-08SenateRead 2nd time
2017-06-08SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 06/08/17
2017-06-08SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2017-06-08SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments)
2017-06-08SenateFavorable with 1 amendment(s) by- Appropriations (930208); YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2017-06-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 06/08/17, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2017-06-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 06/07/17, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed
2017-06-07SenateReferred to Appropriations
2017-06-07SenateIntroduced
2017-06-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S2500 (Similar To) 2017-06-09 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 3-A (Ch. 2017-234)
H3 (Similar To) 2017-06-28 - Chapter No. 2017-234

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
101162Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101167Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1011685Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101171Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101271Amended CodeSee Bill Text
24121Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback