FL S2500 | 2017 | Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-09 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 3-A (Ch. 2017-234)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Providing moneys for the annual period beginning July 1, 2017, and ending June 30, 2018, to fund the Florida Education Finance Program, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supplemental Appropriations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 15 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 15 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09SenateLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 3-A (Ch. 2017-234)
2017-06-09SenateSubstituted HB 3-A
2017-06-09SenateRead 3rd time
2017-06-08SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2017-06-08SenateOrdered engrossed
2017-06-08SenateAmendment(s) adopted (713918)
2017-06-08SenateRead 2nd time
2017-06-08SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 06/08/17
2017-06-08SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2017-06-08SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments)
2017-06-08SenateFavorable with 1 amendment(s) by- Appropriations (713918); YEAS 15 NAYS 2
2017-06-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 06/08/17, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2017-06-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 06/07/17, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed
2017-06-07SenateReferred to Appropriations
2017-06-07SenateIntroduced
2017-06-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S2502 (Similar To) 2017-06-09 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 3-A (Ch. 2017-234)
H3 (Similar To) 2017-06-28 - Chapter No. 2017-234

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/2500A
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/2500A/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/2500A/BillText/e1/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/2500A/Amendment/995174/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/2500A/Amendment/995175/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/2500A/Amendment/713918/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/2500A/Amendment/684550/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/2500A/Amendment/723314/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/2500A/Amendment/413084/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/2500A/Amendment/166280/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/2500A/Amendment/598958/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/2500A/Amendment/791728/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/2500A/Amendment/372070/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/2500A/Amendment/754854/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/2500A/Amendment/716736/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/2500A/Amendment/952044/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/2500A/Amendment/469252/HTML
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/2500A/Vote/SenateVote_s02500A__003.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017A/2500A/Vote/SenateVote_s02500A__004.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback