DE HB349 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Passed on June 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Passed on June 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill codifies that the Superior Court Veterans Treatment Court is a qualified rehabilitation program under ยง 4177D of Title 21 of the Delaware Code for persons seeking to have their driver's licenses reinstated after a DUI. This Act makes technical corrections to conform existing law to the standards of the Delaware Legislative Drafting Manual.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Veterans' Treatment Court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2024-06-18 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2024-05-21 | Reported Out of Committee (Environment, Energy & Transportation) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2024-05-14 | Assigned to Environment, Energy & Transportation Committee in Senate | |
2024-05-14 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2024-04-16 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 3 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2024-03-14 | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |