CT SB01160 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-22 - File Number 177
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-22 - File Number 177
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To increase awareness of and education on perinatal mood and anxiety disorders.
Title
An Act Concerning Perinatal Mood And Anxiety Disorders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-10 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Senate | File Number 177 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 122 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |