CT SB01008 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-11 - File Number 793
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-11 - File Number 793
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Authorizing Bonds Of The State For Capital Improvements And Other Purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | File Number 793 | |
2011-05-11 | Senate Calendar Number 493 | |
2011-05-11 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-05-11 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-05 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/10/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-04-25 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-21 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-03-01 | Public Hearing 03/07 | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |