CT SB00972 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - File Number 814
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - File Number 814
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the recommendations of the Legislative Program Review and Investigations Committee concerning school paraprofessional staffing.
Title
An Act Implementing The Recommendations Of The Program Review And Investigations Committee Concerning School Paraprofessional Training.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | File Number 814 |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 494 |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/11/15 5:00 PM |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Education |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Education |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Education |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Program Review and Investigations |