CT SB00893 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-18 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-18 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a framework for controlling and processing personal data, to establish responsibilities and privacy protection standards for data controllers and processors, to grant consumers the right to access, correct, delete and obtain a copy of personal data and to opt out of the processing of personal data for the purposes of targeted advertising.
Title
An Act Concerning Consumer Privacy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-18 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-04 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-04-08 | Senate | File Number 360 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 222 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/25 |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |