CT SB00437 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To facilitate the free flow of information between partner agencies in the two-generational academic achievement and workforce development initiative.
Title
An Act Concerning A Two-generational Initiative.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 254 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 90 ADOPT (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 92 ADOPT (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 90 ADOPT (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 92 ADOPT (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Public Act 18-19 |
2018-05-07 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2018-05-07 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-05-07 | Senate | House Passed |
2018-04-25 | Senate | House Calendar Number 452 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-24 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2018-04-04 | Senate | File Number 227 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 151 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/20 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |