CT SB00379 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - File Number 575
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - File Number 575
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To limit when an insurer may change prescription drug formularies during the term of certain group and individual health insurance policies.
Title
An Act Limiting Changes To Health Insurers' Prescription Drug Formularies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Senate | File Number 575 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 349 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/18 5:00 PM |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Change of Reference Appropriations |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |