CT SB00377 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To specify that any property tax assessed against the Odd Fellows Home of Connecticut on or after October 1, 2017, shall be calculated only on said home's otherwise taxable property exceeding twenty-five million dollars in assessed value.
Title
An Act Amending The Charter Of The Odd Fellows Home Of Connecticut.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 298 AS AMENDED (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 131 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 131 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Special Act 17-7 |
2017-06-02 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2017-06-02 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-02 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2017-05-19 | Senate | House Calendar Number 520 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-05-17 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6267 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | File Number 518 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 292 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/15 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |