CT SB00361 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To increase job opportunities for individuals with some credit issues who are applying for jobs with employers who are not financial institutions.
Title
An Act Preventing The Use Of Credit Scores By Certain Employers In Hiring Decisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 349 AS AMENDED (Y: 106 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 403 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 402 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 8020 (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 403 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 402 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 8020 (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-06-30 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-06-28 | Public Act 11-223 | |
2011-06-08 | In Concurrence | |
2011-06-08 | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-08 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-06 | House Calendar Number 628 | |
2011-06-06 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-06-06 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | |
2011-06-06 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-06 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8020 | |
2011-05-05 | File Number 742 | |
2011-05-05 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-05-05 | New File by Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-05-05 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-29 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/04/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-04-26 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-25 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-04-07 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-03-14 | File Number 58 | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Calendar Number 72 | |
2011-03-14 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-03-14 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/14/11 10:00 AM | |
2011-03-02 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-01 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-02-10 | Public Hearing 02/15 | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees | |
2011-02-08 | Drafted by Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Vote to Draft | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |