CT SB00194 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-21 - House Calendar Number 523
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-21 - House Calendar Number 523
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a right to housing for all residents of the state.
Title
An Act Establishing A Right To Housing.
Sponsors
House Housing Committee | Sen. Saud Anwar [D] | Rep. Anthony Nolan [D] | Rep. Robyn Porter [D] |
Sen. Rick Lopes [D] | Rep. David Michel [D] | Rep. Minnie Gonzalez [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 230 (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Senate | House Calendar Number 523 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9029 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | File Number 139 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 133 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |